Shears-Barnes v. Acurian Inc
Plaintiff: Kimberly Shears-Barnes
Defendant: Acurian Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00161
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:521
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's response is due by April 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 04/17/2020. (kla)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Acurian Inc (Smith, Sheena)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sheena D. Smith. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/27/2020. (kla)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by S. Jonathan Vine. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/27/2020. (kla)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Sheena D. Smith. Fee $100 receipt number LIT076577. Filed by Acurian Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bmd)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by S. Jonathan Vine. Fee $100 receipt number LIT076577. Filed by Acurian Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bmd)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 the Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on April 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/23/2020. (kla)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kimberly Shears-Barnes (Gallucci, Kas)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Shears-Barnes. Acurian Inc served on 2/28/2020. (Marron, Ronald)
February 20, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT... " (thd)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO THE TELEPHONE CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT with Jury Demand against Acurian Inc filed by Kimberly Shears-Barnes. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT076099. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Docket text modified on 2/20/2020 to include "Class Action".) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shears-Barnes v. Acurian Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Shears-Barnes
Represented By: Ronald A. Marron
Represented By: Alexis M. Wood
Represented By: Kas Larene Gallucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acurian Inc
Represented By: S. Jonathan Vine
Represented By: Sheena D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?