Jones et al v. Cinemark USA Inc
Plaintiff: Leah Jones and David Jones
Defendant: Cinemark USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00195
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/5/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/18/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 03/30/2020. (rmg)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Cinemark USA Inc (Tull, John)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cinemark USA Inc.(Tull, John)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cinemark USA Inc, filed by Leah Jones and David Jones.(kdr)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cinemark USA Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-20-861. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076176. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Cinemark USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cinemark USA Inc
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Brittany S. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Jones
Represented By: Harold F. Cook, Jr.
Represented By: Whitney Murph Cossio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jones
Represented By: Harold F. Cook, Jr.
Represented By: Whitney Murph Cossio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?