Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC v. Applewhite et al
Plaintiff: Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC
Defendant: Darrel Applewhite and Lester Dierksen Memorial Hospice LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00196
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant's Response will be due on or before Wednesday, May 6, 2020. Plaintiff's Reply will be due within seven (7) calendar days after the date the Response is filed. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 04/06/2020. (bgr)
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Joint Motion) by Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC (Price, Joseph)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/23/2020. (bgr)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Agreed) by Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC (Price, Joseph)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Verified Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support (served on Registered Agent), filed by Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC. Lester Dierksen Memorial Hospice LLC served on 2/26/2020. (Price, Joseph)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Verified Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support , filed by Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC. Lester Dierksen Memorial Hospice LLC served on 2/27/2020. (Price, Joseph)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Verified Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support , filed by Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC. Darrel Applewhite served on 2/27/2020. (Price, Joseph)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Defendants' Response will be due on or before Monday, March 23, 2020. Plaintiff's Reply will be due on or before Monday, March 30, 2020. The Court will contact the parties by phone to determine the earliest convenient date for a hearing. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 03/09/2020. (bgr)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time by Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC (Price, Joseph)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle B. Russell on behalf of Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC (Russell, Kyle)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER directing Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction within ten (10) calendar days of service of the Complaint, Summons, and Motion. Plaintiff is directed to file a Reply within five (5) calendar days of the last-filed Response. The Court will set a hearing for a convenient time during the latter part of the week of March 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 02/26/2020. (bgr)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Motion for TRO or Preliminary Injunction filed by Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC. (ajt)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction by Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC. (ajt)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076177.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC v. Applewhite et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Applewhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Dierksen Memorial Hospice LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospice of Central Arkansas LLC
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?