Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC and Helena Chemical Company
Defendant: First Security Bank, Shirley A Cook, Jason C Cook, MFA Oil Company, USA, James D Cook, Cook Family Farms Inc and US Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 4:2020cv00218
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jason C Cook.(Lawson, James)
March 26, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. (Scott, Ralph)
March 26, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Default Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scott, Ralph)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 motion for extension of time to file answer or other responsive pleading. The Court extends Jason C. Cook's deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading until and including 4/2/2020. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/25/2020. (ljb)
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Jason C Cook (Lawson, James)
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MFA Oil Company.(Dennis, Mitchell)
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by First Security Bank.(Jiles, Gary)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice and Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Jason C Cook served on 3/4/2020. (Scott, Ralph)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit, and #9 Affidavit. CORRECTION: The original documents were submitted in error (wrong image files). The correct documents were added to docket entry #7 , #8 , and #9 based on the attached correspondence. (cmn)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Notice and Notice, Consent and Reference of Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. US Department of Agriculture served on 3/10/2020. (Scott, Ralph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Notice and Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. MFA Oil Company served on 3/6/2020. (Scott, Ralph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Notice and Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action ot a Magistrate Judge , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. First Security Bank served on 3/5/2020. (Scott, Ralph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC (Scott, Ralph)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC (Scott, Ralph)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint with exhibits, Notice, Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Cook Family Farms Inc served on 3/2/2020. (Scott, Ralph)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint with exhibits and Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Shirley A Cook served on 3/2/2020. (Scott, Ralph)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint with exhibits and Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to A Magistrate Judge , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. James D Cook served on 3/2/2020. (Scott, Ralph)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR AVOIDANCE OF TRANSFERS AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076238.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Security Bank
Represented By: Gary D. Jiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley A Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason C Cook
Represented By: James D. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MFA Oil Company
Represented By: Mitchell Steven Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Family Farms Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Ralph D. Scott, III
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Chemical Company
Represented By: Ralph D. Scott, III
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?