Salas v. Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Federico Salas
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00280
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/5/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 4/21/2020. (slb)
March 18, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #3 Complaint. (jak)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Federico Salas.(ajt)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-20-1310. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT076509. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Young, Regina) (Docket text modified on 3/18/2020 to establish linkage)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salas v. Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Regina Ann Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Regina Ann Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federico Salas
Represented By: Edward T. Oglesby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?