Ward v. Emberton et al
Plaintiff: Kirby Ward
Defendant: Gene Earnhart and Lucas Emberton
Case Number: 4:2020cv00347
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee received. Amount: $400.00, Receipt # LIT077031. (fjg)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ward must pay the fee by 5/29/2020 or the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/15/2020. (jak)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kirby Ward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kirby Ward. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Emberton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Ward
Represented By: Monzer J. Mansour
Represented By: William Whitfield Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Earnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Emberton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?