Summit 8101 Cantrell Apartments LLC et al v. Trinity Property Management LLC
Plaintiff: Summit Regency Point Apartments LLC and Summit 8101 Cantrell Apartments LLC
Defendant: Trinity Property Management LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00353
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Summit 8101 Cantrell Apartments LLC, Summit Regency Point Apartments LLC. (Irby, Scott)
April 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 and #7 Notices of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket texts were modified to correct the attorney's entering appearance as Joseph R. Dulle and Paul J. Puricelli as marked on the documents. (jak)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/13/2020 and Bench Trial set for 6/21/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/23/2020. (hml)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Robinson on behalf of Trinity Property Management LLC (Robinson, Jon)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay William Kutchka on behalf of Trinity Property Management LLC (Kutchka, Jay)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Trinity Property Management LLC.(Brockett, Christopher)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Puricelli on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Irby, Scott) (Docket text modified on 4/23/2020 to correct the attorney entering appearance) (jak)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Dulle on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Irby, Scott) (Docket text modified on 4/23/2020 to correct the attorney entering appearance) (jak)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Puricelli. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 04/17/2020. (kla)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R. Dulle. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 04/17/2020. (kla)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Paul J. Puricelli. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3685979. Filed by Summit 8101 Cantrell Apartments LLC, Summit Regency Point Apartments LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lancaster, Stephen)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Joseph R. Dulle. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3685966. Filed by Summit 8101 Cantrell Apartments LLC, Summit Regency Point Apartments LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lancaster, Stephen)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trinity Property Management LLC filed by Summit Regency Point Apartments LLC, Summit 8101 Cantrell Apartments LLC. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076636.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit 8101 Cantrell Apartments LLC et al v. Trinity Property Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Regency Point Apartments LLC
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Represented By: Stephen R. Lancaster
Represented By: Joseph Richard Dulle
Represented By: Paul J. Puricelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit 8101 Cantrell Apartments LLC
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Represented By: Stephen R. Lancaster
Represented By: Joseph Richard Dulle
Represented By: Paul J. Puricelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Property Management LLC
Represented By: Jon P. Robinson
Represented By: Jay William Kutchka
Represented By: Christopher D. Brockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?