State Farm Life Insurance Company v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Maria Theresa Diaz Jackson, Trisha Smith, Linda James and Ronnie Jackson
Case Number: 4:2020cv00411
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Consent Judgment. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #5 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT JUDGMENT: The parties agree that the proceeds of the life insurance policy together with all accrued interest shall be paid to Ronnie Jackson and Trisha Smith and that Maria Theresa Diaz Jackson and Linda James disclaim any interest in order to settle the dispute regarding the change of beneficiary form. That the parties shall each bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/12/2020. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ronnie Jackson, Linda James, Trisha Smith.(Waddell, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Answer of M. T. D. Jackson ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Maria Theresa Diaz Jackson.(Spears, Donald)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by State Farm Life Insurance Company (Runyon, Emily)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against All Defendants, filed by State Farm Life Insurance Company. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076870.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Life Insurance Company v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Theresa Diaz Jackson
Represented By: Donald M. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisha Smith
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda James
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Jackson
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily M. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?