C&C International Trading Company v. Sysco Corporation et al
Plaintiff: C&C International Trading Company
Defendant: Buckhead Beef Company, Trinity Seafood Inc and Sysco Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00415
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Buckhead Meat Company, Trinity Seafood Inc. (Wilson, Mason)
June 4, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () by Buckhead Meat Company, Trinity Seafood Inc (Wilson, Mason)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by C&C International Trading Company(Siegel, Eric)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 05/21/2020. (bgr)
May 21, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by C&C International Trading Company (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Redlined Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Clean Amended Complaint)(Siegel, Eric)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Buckhead Beef Company, Sysco Corporation, Trinity Seafood Inc (Wilson, Mason)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Wilson, Mason)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM () by All Defendants (Wilson, Mason)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Approve Waiver of Local Counsel under Local Rule 83.5(d). Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 04/30/2020. (bgr)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Approve/Approval Waiver of Local Counsel under Local Rule 83.5(d) by C&C International Trading Company (Siegel, Eric)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice , filed by C&C International Trading Company. Trinity Seafood Inc served on 4/24/2020. (Calhoun, Joseph)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons, Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice , filed by C&C International Trading Company. Sysco Corporation served on 4/23/2020. (Calhoun, Joseph)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, filed by C&C International Trading Company. Buckhead Beef Company served on 4/24/2020. (Calhoun, Joseph)
April 23, 2020 Summons Issued as to Sysco Corporation, Buckhead Beef Company, Trinity Seafood, Inc. Summons returned to counsel for plaintiff. (jap)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (additional pages included) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (thd)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric L. Siegel. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 04/20/2020. (bgr)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Eric L. Siegel. Fee $100, receipt number LIT076872. Filed by C&C International Trading Company. (bmd)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by C&C International Trading Company. Fee $400 received. Receipt Number LIT076872. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C&C International Trading Company v. Sysco Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckhead Beef Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Seafood Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C&C International Trading Company
Represented By: Eric L. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?