Powell v. Wehco Video Inc et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Powell
Defendant: Wehco Video Inc Client Care, Skyler Hendrix, Wehco Media Inc, Lori Haight, Wehco Video Inc, Krystal Joiner, Brandon Jones and Robert Sieck
Case Number: 4:2020cv00452
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Pamela Powell re #5 Order. (fjg)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP; dismissing without prejudice #2 Ms. Powell's complaint; and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/13/2020. (ljb)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Pamela Powell re #3 Order provisionally granting Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (fjg)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on on 4/24/2020. (kdr)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand and Class Action Request for Certification against All Defendants, filed by Pamela Powell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pamela Powell. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Wehco Video Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wehco Video Inc Client Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyler Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wehco Media Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Haight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wehco Video Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystal Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sieck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?