Salam v. Blend et al
Plaintiff: Minal Jabbar Salam and Al Jabbar Salam
Defendant: Blend, Payne, Parker, Powell, Gibson, Sondra Parker and Estella Bland
Case Number: 4:2020cv00462
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (csf)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: If Defendants intend to pursue a defense that Plaintiff failed to exhaust his administrative remedies before filing this lawsuit, it must be raised by motion for summary judgment on or before July 22, 2020. Discovery is stayed until the exhaustion issue is decided. The Clerk is directed to update the docket sheet to reflect the full names of Defendants Estella Bland and Sondra Parker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/23/2020. (csf)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Bland, Parker.(Eubanks, Brent)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Jay Eubanks on behalf of Bland, Parker (Eubanks, Brent)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving and adopting #5 Recommendation as this Court's findings in all respects; and dismissing without prejudice claims against Defendants Powell, Gibson, and Payne. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 05/26/2020. (ajt)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that claims against Defendants Powell, Gibson, and Payne be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to state a claim for relief. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/5/2020. (jbh)
April 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to Bland, Parker and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Bland and Parker; directing the United States Marshal to serve Defendants Bland and Parker with copies of the #2 complaint, with any attachments, and summonses, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/30/2020. (jbh)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing the Clerk of the Court to correct the name of Plaintiff Minal Jabbar Salam to Al Jabbar Salam and to change the name of Defendant Blend to Defendant Bland; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Varner Supermax Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/30/2020. (jbh)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Minal Jabbar Salam. (ljb)
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Minal Jabbar Salam. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salam v. Blend et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sondra Parker
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Bland
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minal Jabbar Salam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Jabbar Salam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?