Little Rock Family Planning Services et al v. Rutledge et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Tvedten and Little Rock Family Planning Services
Defendant: John H Scribner, Veryl D Hodges, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, Rodney Griffin, Sylvia D Simon, Brian T Hyatt, Nathaniel Smith, Timothy C Paden, Rhys L Branman, Matt Durrett, Larry Jegley, Omar T Atiq, David L Staggs, Marie Holder, Larry D Lovell, Robert Breving, Jr and Don R Phillips
Case Number: 4:2020cv00470
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #32 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/11/2020. (kdr)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Little Rock Family Planning Services has filed #31 a notice of voluntary dismissal. Accordingly, #29 Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/11/2020. (kdr)
May 26, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten (Godesky, Leah)
May 15, 2020 Filing 30 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan)
May 15, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () by All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan)
May 15, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Sandman. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 05/08/2020. (rmg)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #5 , #14 , #21 motion for temporary restraining order; granting #3 motion for expedited leave to file a supplemental complaint; granting #7 motion for expedited pre-hearing discovery; granting #13 motion for leave to use a pseudonym and for a protective order; and granting #19 motion to substitute the proposed supplemental complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/7/2020. (thd)
May 4, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Supplemental Declaration of Lori Williams, M.S.N., A.P.R.N., in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Godesky, Leah)
May 4, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Dylan)
May 3, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT / COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against Omar T Atiq, Rhys L Branman, Robert Breving, Jr, Rodney Griffin, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Brian T Hyatt, Larry Jegley, Larry D Lovell, Timothy C Paden, Don R Phillips, Leslie Rutledge, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, Nathaniel Smith, David L Staggs, filed by Thomas Tvedten, Little Rock Family Planning Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Godesky, Leah)
May 1, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re #21 Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and/or Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and/or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re #19 Motion to Substitute filed by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Substitute Proposed Supplemental Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and/or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re #14 Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to use a pseudonym and for a Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jennifer Sandman. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer Sandman)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 EVIDENTIARY SUBMISSIONS in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY Memorandum of Law in support of #3 Motion by Little Rock Family Planning Services, Thomas Tvedten. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE In Opposition to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 MOTION for Leave to File filed by All Defendants. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion filed by All Plaintiffs.(Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Expedited Pre-Hearing Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (jak)(Docket text modified on 5/1/2020 to correct a typographical error)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs and/or Preliminary Injunction (Document provisionally filed pursuant to #1 Order and originally filed in case number 4:19-cv-00449-KGB) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(jak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion for Expedited Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by all Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (thd)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Expedited Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Document originally filed in 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(thd)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against all Defendants filed by all Plaintiffs. (Document provisionally filed pursuant to #1 Order and originally filed in case number 4:19-cv-00449-KGB.) (thd)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER entered by Judge Kristine G. Baker in case number 4:19-cv-00449-KGB directing the Clerk of Court to file provisionally plaintiff's supplemental complaint for injunctive and declaratory relief and all other related filings as a separate action by random assignment. Signed on 5/1/2020. (Case 4:20-cv-000470-BSM randomly assigned to Judge Brian S. Miller.)(thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Rock Family Planning Services et al v. Rutledge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Scribner
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veryl D Hodges
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Rutledge
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L Rutledge
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Griffin
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia D Simon
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian T Hyatt
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Smith
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C Paden
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhys L Branman
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Durrett
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jegley
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar T Atiq
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Staggs
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Holder
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry D Lovell
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Breving, Jr
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don R Phillips
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Julia C. Benafield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tvedten
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Ashley Robertson
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Represented By: Brooke-Augusta Ware
Represented By: Maya Zagayer
Represented By: Christopher P. Burke
Represented By: Ruth E. Harlow
Represented By: Meagan M. Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Rock Family Planning Services
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Ashley Robertson
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Represented By: Brooke-Augusta Ware
Represented By: Maya Zagayer
Represented By: Christopher P. Burke
Represented By: Ruth E. Harlow
Represented By: Meagan M. Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?