Burton v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: James Burton
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00500
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week 5/3/2021 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Discovery due by 2/17/2021; Motions due by 3/4/2021; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 4/12/2021; Status Report due by 3/4/2021. Signed at the direction of the Court on 05/29/2020. (tmw)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Moore on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moore, John)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Strabala, Richard)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/13/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/27/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 5/3/2021 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 05/14/2020. (tmw)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (ajt)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (ajt)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(ajt)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed by James Burton.(ajt)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-20-2802. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT077216. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Shane Strabala
Represented By: John E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burton
Represented By: Jake M. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?