Brennan v. USA et al
Plaintiff: David Brennan
Defendant: Steven Mnuchin, Small Business Administration, USA and Department of Treasury
Case Number: 4:2020cv00505
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Department of Treasury, Small Business Administration, USA (Smith, Shannon)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Defendants' Opposition to Emergency #2 MOTION for Exparte Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction filed by David Brennan.(jap)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Department of Treasury, Small Business Administration, USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Shannon)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon S. Smith on behalf of USA (Smith, Shannon)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong header information). The correct document was added to docket entry #6 and is attached hereto for service on the parties.(jak)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the defendants to respond to #2 Mr. Brennan's motion on or before Tuesday, 5/26/2020. Mr. Brennan may reply to defendants' response on or before Thursday, 5/28/2020. After receiving the parties' filings, the Court will determine whether to conduct a hearing on Mr. Brennan's pending motion. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/19/2020. (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
May 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to USA, U.S. Department of Justice and returned to Plaintiff for service. (bmd)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Brennan. All Defendants served on 5/15/20. (bmd)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 motion to the extent that Mr. Brennan requests an ex parte ruling without notice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(1); and holding under advisement Mr. Brennan's request for a temporary restraining order and preliminary and permanent injunction pursuant to Rule 65. The Court will rule on Mr. Brennan's request after defendants have been notified of the relief Mr. Brennan seeks. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/14/2020. (jbh)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 Emergency Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction filed by David Brennan. (ajt)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by David Brennan. (ajt)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND EMERGENCY PETITION FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ALTERNATIVELY FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants filed by David Brennan. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT077244.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brennan v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration
Represented By: Shannon S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Shannon S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury
Represented By: Shannon S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?