Bradley v. United Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: James Bradley
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00520
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Henry Piazza on behalf of James Bradley (Piazza, Samuel)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT UNITED SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER. #10 Motion is granted and Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company shall have until 30 days after the issuance of an Order on the pending Motion for Transfer and Coordination within which to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/24/2020. (jak)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United Specialty Insurance Company (Horton, Johnathan)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 and #8 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant. James Regan and Thomas Cahill are hereby admitted to appear, before this Court, as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/22/2020. (ljb)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Thomas J. Cahill. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3731231. Filed by United Specialty Insurance Company (Horton, Johnathan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James J. Regan. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3731230. Filed by United Specialty Insurance Company (Horton, Johnathan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by James Bradley Letter to Judge Moody (Potts, Dylan)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant has until 6/30/2020 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/11/20. (dpb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants (Horton, Johnathan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek H. Potts on behalf of James Bradley (Potts, Derek)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Bradley. United Specialty Insurance Company served on 5/22/2020. (Potts, Dylan)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United Specialty Insurance Company filed by James Bradley. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT077289.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. United Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bradley
Represented By: Dylan Hugh Potts
Represented By: Derek H. Potts
Represented By: Samuel Henry Piazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas J. Cahill
Represented By: Johnathan D. Horton
Represented By: James J. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?