Graham v. Olameter Corporation
Plaintiff: Korey Graham
Defendant: Olameter Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00703
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Whitaker. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 07/21/2020. (rmg)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zoe W. Vereulen. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 07/21/2020. (rmg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by David M. Whitaker. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3751732. Filed by Olameter Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Vandiver, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Zoe W. Vereulen. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3751723. Filed by Olameter Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Vandiver, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/23/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/8/2020 ; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 12/6/2021 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 07/17/2020. (rmg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Olameter Corporation.(Vandiver, Brian)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time. Answer due by 07/16/2020. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 06/29/2020. (rmg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Extend Time by Olameter Corporation (Vandiver, Brian)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Anthony Vandiver on behalf of Olameter Corporation (Vandiver, Brian)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against Olameter Corporation, filed by Korey Graham. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT077501.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Olameter Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olameter Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korey Graham
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?