Smith v. Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Shawn Smith
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00707
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 22 USCA Appeal Fees received $505.00 receipt number LIT078197 re #19 Notice of Appeal filed by Shawn Smith. (fjg)
July 22, 2020 Filing 21 USCA Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule as to #19 Notice of Appeal filed by Shawn Smith. USCA Case Number 20-2486. (ajt)
July 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #19 Notice of Appeal re #13 Order and 18 Order. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL: REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPTS SHOULD BE FILED WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERK. (ajt)
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #13 Order and 18 Order by Shawn Smith. (Bates, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 7/21/2020 to establish linkage) (jak)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #14 Plaintiff's Motion Clarify or, Alternatively, For Relief Under Rule 60(B) and Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Questions of Law. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 07/21/20. (dmm)
July 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #19 Notice of Appeal. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #13 and 18 Orders. (jak)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Waddell, William)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Clarify Or, Alternatively, For Relief Under Rule 60(B) and Plaintiffs Motion for Certification of Questions of Law filed by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Waddell, William)
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Motion to Clarify filed by Shawn Smith. (Bates, Joseph)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Clarify Or, Alternatively, For Relief Under Rule 60(B) and Plaintiffs Motion for Certification of Questions of Law by Shawn Smith (Bates, Joseph)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/25/2020. (jbh)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Waddell, William)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply. Accordingly, Defendant must file the reply, attached to the motion as an exhibit, by 5 p.m., Monday, June 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 06/22/20. (dmm)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Reply Brief)(Waddell, William)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shawn Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bates, Joseph)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jake G. Windley on behalf of Shawn Smith (Windley, Jake)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Waddell, William)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State of Arkansas Title Transfer to Smith with Sales Price & Odometer Reading, #2 Exhibit Smith Odometer Disclosure Statement)(Waddell, William)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Waddell, William)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Waddell, William)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/11/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/25/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 6/4/20. (mmb)
June 4, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury demand" as marked on the document. (jak)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Shawn Smith. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 6/4/2020 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company from Lonoke County Circuit Court, case number 43CV-20-00346. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT077510. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Smith
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: John M. Rainwater
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Represented By: Jake G. Windley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?