Boles v. Lindsey Management Co Inc et al
Plaintiff: Carole Denise Boles
Defendant: Chris Dermanouelian, Links at Cadron Valley Apartments Management Company Inc and Lindsey Management Co Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00710
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Party Chris Dermanouelian by Carole Denise Boles (Richardson, Scott)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 motion for extension of time. Mr. Dermanouelian must respond to Ms. Boles' complaint on or before 7/31/2020. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/21/2020. (jbh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lindsey Management Co Inc, Links at Cadron Valley Apartments Management Company Inc.(Campbell, Katherine)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Chris Dermanouelian (Campbell, Katherine)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Moore on behalf of Chris Dermanouelian, Lindsey Management Co Inc, Links at Cadron Valley Apartments Management Company Inc (Moore, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion for extension of time. Defendants must respond to Ms. Boles' complaint on or before 7/20/2020. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/13/2020. (jbh)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants (Campbell, Katherine)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Carole Denise Boles. Chris Dermanouelian served on 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Green Card)(Richardson, Scott)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Carole Denise Boles. Links at Cadron Valley Apartments Management Company Inc served on 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Richardson, Scott)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Carole Denise Boles. Lindsey Management Co Inc served on 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Richardson, Scott)
June 25, 2020 Summons Issued as to Chris Dermanouelian and returned to attorney for plaintiff. (jap)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Carole Denise Boles. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT077516.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boles v. Lindsey Management Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Dermanouelian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Links at Cadron Valley Apartments Management Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Management Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Denise Boles
Represented By: Laura Lensing Calhoun
Represented By: Scott P. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?