Barnes v. Compass Group USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Connie Barnes
Defendant: Compass Group USA Inc, Compass One and Morrison Healthcare
Case Number: 4:2020cv00712
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/20/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Motions to Amend and Join Other Parties due by 3/24/2021; Discovery due by 4/23/2021; Motions due by 5/24/2021; Status Report due by 5/24/2021; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 8/20/2021. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/22/2020. (hml)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Connie Barnes. (bmd)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Connie Barnes re #2 Answer to Complaint. (bmd)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Compass Group USA Inc, Compass One, Morrison Healthcare (Hodges, M.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/21/2020 and Jury Trial set for 9/20/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/30/2020. (hml)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Compass Group USA Inc, Compass One, Morrison Healthcare.(Hodges, M.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Connie Barnes. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT077535.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Compass Group USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Barnes
Represented By: Marcus Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?