Hudson Homes & Designs LLC v. Kennedy et al
Plaintiff: Hudson Homes & Designs LLC
Defendant: Chris Nelson Construction LLC, Marcilyn Kennedy, Joshua Kennedy and Michael Moore
Case Number: 4:2020cv00720
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Joshua Kennedy, Marcilyn Kennedy, Michael Moore by Chris Nelson Construction LLC (Block, Alexander)
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Joshua Kennedy, Marcilyn Kennedy.(Simpson, James)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Chris Nelson Construction LLC (Hildebrand, Rachel)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Michael Moore.(Sayes, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Chris Nelson Construction LLC.(Block, Alexander)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel E. Hildebrand on behalf of Chris Nelson Construction LLC (Hildebrand, Rachel)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Cale Block on behalf of Chris Nelson Construction LLC (Block, Alexander)
June 23, 2020 Summons Issued as to Chris Nelson Construction LLC, Michael Moore and returned to attorney for plaintiff. (jap)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Hudson Homes & Designs LLC (Parsons, Gavin)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Marcilyn Kennedy by Hudson Homes & Designs LLC. (Parsons, Gavin)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joshua Kennedy by Hudson Homes & Designs LLC. (Parsons, Gavin)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David E. Bennett. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 06/11/2020. (rmg)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gavin B. Parsons. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 06/11/2020. (rmg)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Copyright submitted electronically by the Clerk's Office to the Register of Copyrights on 6/10/2020. (cdw)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original main document was attached to the docket in error (poorly-formatted image file) based on a technical error by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (thd)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by David E. Bennett. Fee of $100 paid. Receipt Number LIT077600. Filed by Hudson Homes & Designs LLC. (kdr)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Gavin B. Parsons. Fee of $100 paid. Receipt number LIT077600. Filed by Hudson Homes & Designs LLC. (kdr)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Hudson Homes & Designs LLC. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT077600. Summons not issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson Homes & Designs LLC v. Kennedy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Homes & Designs LLC
Represented By: Lauren Grinder
Represented By: David E. Bennett
Represented By: Gavin B. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Nelson Construction LLC
Represented By: Rachel E. Hildebrand
Represented By: Alexander Cale Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcilyn Kennedy
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Kennedy
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moore
Represented By: James Melton Sayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?