Smith v. Arkansas State Military Department
Plaintiff: Floyd Terry Smith
Defendant: Arkansas State Military Department
Case Number: 4:2020cv00737
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: If Mr. Smith intends to oppose the #6 motion to dismiss, he should file a motion for leave to file a brief out of time (and attach to that motion the underlying brief he wants to file) by Friday, 8/29/2020. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/4/2020. (jbh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Arkansas State Military Department. (France, Vincent)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Arkansas State Military Department (France, Vincent)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. France on behalf of Arkansas State Military Department (France, Vincent)
June 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to Arkansas State Military Department and Camp Robinson Police Department and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Smith's application to proceed IFP; and directing the U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas to serve summons and #2 complaint on Defendant, without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Smith is hereby notified of his responsibilities to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/18/2020. (ljb)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 06/11/2020. (ajt)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Arkansas State Military Department filed by Floyd Terry Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Floyd Terry Smith. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Arkansas State Military Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Military Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Terry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?