Koon v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Donna Louise Koon
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00761
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Louise Koon. Social Security Administration served on 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service)(Olinsky, Howard)
June 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (ljb)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. The Clerk is directed to issue summons to counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/19/2020. (rph)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Donna Louise Koon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donna Louise Koon. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koon v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Louise Koon
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?