Saul v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Saul
Defendant: Russellville Holdings LLC, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, RCCH Healthcare Partners and Russellville Holdings LLC doing business as Mary's Regional Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2020cv00786
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Central Division Office
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Reply)(Walters, Jason)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion for Leave to File, #9 Response to Motion filed by Jeremy Saul. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File by Jeremy Saul (Lacy, Brandon)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike filed by Jeremy Saul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Lacy, Brandon)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Walters, Jason)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Strike () by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Walters, Jason)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Walters, Jason)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 motion for voluntary dismissal of separate defendants RCCH Healthcare Partners and Russellville Holdings, LLC d/b/a/ St. Mary's Regional Medical Center. Separate defendants RCCH and St. Mary's are dismissed without prejudice as defendants in this action. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/26/2020. (jbh)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (ajt)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal of Separate Defendants RCCH Healthcare Partners and Russellville Holdings, LLC by Jeremy Saul. (ajt)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Jeremy Saul.(ajt)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company from Pope County Circuit Court, case number 58CV-20-235. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT077817. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saul v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russellville Holdings LLC
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Allen Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCCH Healthcare Partners
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russellville Holdings LLC doing business as Mary's Regional Medical Center
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Saul
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?