Murphy et al v. Bunge North America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Banister and Jonathan Murphy doing business as Murphy Trucking
Defendant: Bunge North America Inc and Kris Tillie
Case Number: 4:2020cv00890
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting as modified #7 Motion. As to Murphy, this case is stayed until he pays Bunge and Tillie $6,500 as a reasonable fee and costs. As to Banister, the case is stayed until he pays Bunge and Tillie $6,000 as a reasonable fee and costs. The Court also administratively terminates this case. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/16/2020. (jak)
September 16, 2020 Case Stayed and administratively terminated pursuant to #9 Order. (jak)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Stay, Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and For Payment of Costs Under Rule 41(d) filed by Bunge North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2009 Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 2009 AM and Supp Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - 2009 2nd AM and Supp Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - 2019 Order, #5 Exhibit E - 2020 Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Eva Madison)(Madison, Eva)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay re #2 Complaint , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint and For Payment of Costs Under Rule 41(d) () by Bunge North America Inc (Madison, Eva)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hobbs Benson on behalf of Bunge North America Inc (Benson, Margaret)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original civil cover sheet was not attached to the docket entry due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The cover sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Bunge North America Inc identifying Corporate Parent Bunge Limited for Bunge North America Inc. (bmd)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva C. Madison on behalf of Bunge North America Inc. (bmd)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jonathan Murphy, Vincent Banister.(bmd)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bunge North America Inc from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 35CV-20-229. Fee $400 received. Receipt number LIT078384. (bmd) (Civil Cover Sheet added as an attachment on 8/6/2020 due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office) (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. Bunge North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bunge North America Inc
Represented By: Margaret Hobbs Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Tillie
Represented By: Margaret Hobbs Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Banister
Represented By: Priscilla Copelin-Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Murphy doing business as Murphy Trucking
Represented By: Priscilla Copelin-Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?