Wright v. Higgins et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wright
Defendant: Merissa Johnson and Eric Higgins
Case Number: 4:2020cv00891
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Eric Higgins served on 9/23/2020. (ajt)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending Merissa Johnson be dismissed from this lawsuit, without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/15/2020. (jbh)
September 15, 2020 Summons Issued as to Eric Higgins and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Mr. Higgins; and directing the Marshal to serve Mr. Higgins with the summons and a copy of the #2 complaint, along with any attachments, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/15/2020. (jbh)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/14/2020. (csf)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jeremy Wright. (kdr)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeremy Wright. (kdr)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Mr. Wright to file an amended complaint within 30 days to supplement the allegations in his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/14/2020. (jbh)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator at the Pulaski County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 08/14/2020. (ajt)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jeremy Wright. (llg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Wright. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Higgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?