Taylor v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Stephanie Alicia Taylor
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00925
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Tucker on behalf of Social Security Administration (Tucker, Eric)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 08/27/2020. (ajt)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER terminating #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/21/2020. (rph)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. The Clerk is directed to issue summons to counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/21/2020. (rph)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephanie Alicia Taylor (Baltz, Randolph)
August 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and mailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (ajt)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court directs Plaintiff to fill out an updated #1 AO240 application in its entirety and return it within 30 days of this Order. Failure to do so may result in summary dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 08/13/2020. (lmc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Stephanie Alicia Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephanie Alicia Taylor. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Eric B. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Alicia Taylor
Represented By: Randolph M. Baltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?