Lewis v. Trails End RV Park Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sara Lewis
Defendant: Evelyn Phelps, Morgan Maumelle Self Storage Inc and Trails End RV Park Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00948
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trails End RV Park Inc.(Goodman, Ron)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Evelyn Phelps.(Goodman, Ron)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Morgan Maumelle Self Storage Inc.(Goodman, Ron)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ron L. Goodman on behalf of All Defendants (Goodman, Ron)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Conrad Thomas Odom, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/22/2020. (amr)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sara Lewis (Odom, Conrad)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sara Lewis. Evelyn Phelps served on 9/13/2020. (Sanford, Joshua)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sara Lewis. Trails End RV Park Inc served on 9/13/2020. (Sanford, Joshua)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sara Lewis. Morgan Maumelle Self Storage Inc served on 9/13/2020. (Sanford, Joshua)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sara Lewis. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT078549.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Trails End RV Park Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Phelps
Represented By: Ron L. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Maumelle Self Storage Inc
Represented By: Ron L. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trails End RV Park Inc
Represented By: Ron L. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Lewis
Represented By: Conrad Thomas Odom, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?