Layton et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Plaintiff: Mary Louise Layton and George R Layton
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00957
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean K. Burke on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Burke, Sean)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne A. Gruner on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Gruner, Anne)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Layton et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the USDC West Virginia Northern and assigned case number 1:20-cv-00083, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00957-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, Northern District of West Virginia, Case Number 1:20-cv-00083. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Case transferred to Eastern District of Arkansas re MDL 2949. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (jmm) [Transferred from wvnd on 8/19/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPML TRANSFER ORDER (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 2949) Transferring 38 action(s) to Judge Kristine G. Baker in the E.D. Arkansas. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 8/7/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2949 et al. (jmm) [Transferred from wvnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 5/29/2020. (Downs, Taylor) [Transferred from wvnd on 8/19/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. to File Responsive Pleadings by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Kennedy, E.) [Transferred from wvnd on 8/19/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Courtesy Copy of Motion to Transfer filing to the MDL Panel. (jmm) [Transferred from wvnd on 8/19/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc., filed by Mary Louise Layton, George R. Layton. Filing Fee Paid $400 - Receipt #0424-3035321. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dk) [Transferred from wvnd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Layton et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Louise Layton
Represented By: Taylor Burkhart Downs
Represented By: Timothy J. Manchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George R Layton
Represented By: Taylor Burkhart Downs
Represented By: Timothy J. Manchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: Sean K. Burke
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?