Craugh et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Plaintiff: Gary Craugh, Pamela Jo Craugh and United Healthcare Services Inc
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00959
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Central Division Office
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael O. Fawaz on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Fawaz, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Craugh et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the USDC Wisconsin Western and assigned case number 3:20-cv-00270, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00959-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 18 Case electronically transferred in from U.S. District Court, District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00270. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel on 8/7/2020. (kwf) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Van Dyke, David) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Falk, Matthew) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 CLAIM, CROSSCLAIM against Gary Craugh by United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Falk, Matthew) Modified on 7/15/2020. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Robert Falk for Plaintiff United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Falk, Matthew) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Van Dyke, David) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendant's unopposed draft protective order #8 is accepted and entered as the court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/4/2020. (kwf) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 6/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due 4/19/2021. Settlement Letters due 8/13/2021. Motions in Limine due 8/20/2021. Responses due 9/10/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2021 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 10/12/2021 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/4/2020. (kwf) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 Brief in Support of #8 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Protective Order) (Carpenter, Tiffany) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Carpenter, Tiffany) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/29/2020 [:10] (cak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Tiffany Leigh Carpenter Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/21/2020. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Tiffany Leigh Carpenter Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2664419.) by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Carpenter, Tiffany) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2020 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiffs Gary Craugh, Pamela Jo Craugh (McLaughlin, George) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corporate Affiliations) (Van Dyke, David) Modified on 3/27/2020. (kwf) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by David C. Van Dyke for Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Van Dyke, David) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 3/25/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (McLaughlin, George) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2650575.), filed by Gary Craugh, Pamela Jo Craugh. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (McLaughlin, George) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craugh et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: David C. Van Dyke
Represented By: Tiffany Leigh Carpenter
Represented By: Michael O. Fawaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Craugh
Represented By: George E. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Jo Craugh
Represented By: George E. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Healthcare Services Inc
Represented By: Matthew Robert Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?