Lopez et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Plaintiff: Gualberto Lopez and Luz M Lopez
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00979
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael O. Fawaz on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Fawaz, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana)
September 18, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana J. Ash on behalf of Wright Medical Technology Inc (Ash, Dana)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 42 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Lopez et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc, originally filed in the U.S. District Court of New Jersey and assigned case number 1:19-cv-12583, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00979-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2020. (cmn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 41 Case electronically transferred in from District of New Jersey, case number 1:19-cv-12583. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Arkansas Eastern. (dd, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 13, 2020 NOTICE: Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the upcoming conference call on 8/20/2020 at 10:00 A.M.: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. (slc) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/5/2020. (slc) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay All Dates and Deadlines Pending Ruling of JPML on Motion to Transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/3/2020. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/2/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 36 First MOTION to Stay ALL DATES AND DEADLINES PENDING RULING OF JPML ON MOTION TO TRANSFER by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(SCHRAMA, MARTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
May 21, 2020 NOTICE: The parties shall utilize the following dial-in information for the upcoming telephone conference on 6/2/2020 at 2:00 P.M.: 1-888-684-8852 / Access Code 2828702# / Security Code 654321#. (slc) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, GEORGE E. MCLAUGHLIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 35 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice George E. McLaughlin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10654389.) (SCHRAMA, MARTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Thomas R. Leemon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/7/2020. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 33 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHRAMA, MARTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/5/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/5/2020. (slc) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, Thomas Leemon, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (rtm, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thomas R. Leemon to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10245058.) (SCHRAMA, MARTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the telephone conference on 1/13/2020 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 2/5/2020 at 3:30 P.M. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/13/2020. (slc) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: Due to the Court's calendar, the telephone conference on 1/6/2020 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 1/13/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/17/2019. (slc) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tiffany L. Carpenter, Esquire; shall make a payment of $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/8/2019. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Harry M. Byrne, #2 Certification Tiffany L. Carpenter, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BYRNE, HARRY) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/3/2019. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/3/2019. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #23 Consent MOTION for Protective Order . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BYRNE, HARRY) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying without prejudice Defendant's #16 Motion for Protective Order; ORDERED that the parties shall submit a Discovery Confidentiality Order consistent with Appendix S of the Local Civil Rule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/15/2019. (dmr) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #16 Consent MOTION for Protective Order . Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/13/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic.) (rtm, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, David C. Van Dyke, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (rtm, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Harry M. Byrne to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BYRNE, HARRY) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/6/2020 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 4/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/13/2019. (rtm, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Thomas R. Leemon, Esq. Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/13/2019. (rtm, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for George E. McLaughlin, Esq. Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/13/2019. (rtm, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #16 Consent MOTION for Protective Order . Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BYRNE, HARRY) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: By consent, (pending) pro hac counsel shall be, and is hereby, permitted to appear by telephone at the scheduling conference on 8/13/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/12/2019. (slc) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(SCHRAMA, MARTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 2, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion for Pro Hac Vice #13 filed by M. Schram on 8/1/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice to receive NEF. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Motion USING Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice George E. McLaughlin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9861025.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Supplement EFC notification)(SCHRAMA, MARTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number CAM010594 (rtm, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thomas R. Leemon to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9850459.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Supplement notice to receive electronic filings, #4 Certification)(SCHRAMA, MARTIN) Modified on 7/30/2019 (rtm, ). [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Discovery Plan by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC..(BYRNE, HARRY) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David C. Van Dyke, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/23/2019. (dmr) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC. identifying Wright Medical Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BYRNE, HARRY) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Initial Conference set for 8/13/2019 10:00 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/16/2019. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC..(BYRNE, HARRY) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BYRNE, HARRY) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by HARRY M. BYRNE on behalf of WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC. (BYRNE, HARRY) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GUALBERTO LOPEZ, LUZ M. LOPEZ. All Defendants. (SCHRAMA, MARTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Certification on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (SCHRAMA, MARTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
May 17, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/17/2019. (cry, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (mmb, ) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9670466) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GUALBERTO LOPEZ, LUZ M LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(SCHRAMA, MARTIN) [Transferred from njd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gualberto Lopez
Represented By: Martin P. Schrama
Represented By: Martin Paul Schrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz M Lopez
Represented By: Martin P. Schrama
Represented By: Martin Paul Schrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: Harry M. Byrne
Represented By: Dana J. Ash
Represented By: Michael O. Fawaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?