Pulaski County Arkansas et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Pulaski County Arkansas and Jefferson County Arkansas
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Walmart Inc, WSE Management LLC, WSE Investment LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East Inc and Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Case Number: 4:2020cv00983
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER to the Clerk for the Circuit Court of Jefferson County transmitting a copy of the case file and certified copies of #29 Order to Remand and the docket sheet via certified mail. (ljb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #8 motion to expedite; granting #6 Plaintiff's motion to remand; denying #15 motion to stay; denying as moot #5 Defendants' motion to further extend their answer time; and directing the Clerk to immediately transfer this case to the Clerk of the Jefferson County Circuit Court and then close this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/25/2020. (ljb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Carlson on behalf of WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Carlson, James)
September 18, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin L. Burke on behalf of WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Burke, Erin)
September 18, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lovrien on behalf of WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Lovrien, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Anticipated Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc. (Tull, John)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File. Wal Mart's motion for leave to file a reply is granted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/14/20. (dpb)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 , #18 , and #19 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants. Erin L. Burke, James W. Carlson, and Christopher Lovrien are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/9/2020. (ljb)
September 9, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #22 MOTION for Leave to File Reply. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #20 Response. (jak)
September 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Reply re #20 Response by WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Document Reply)(Tull, John) (Docket text modified on 9/9/2020 to establish linkage) (jak)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Expedite , #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc. (Tull, John)
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Anticipated Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, City of Worcester v. Purdue, #2 Exhibit B, Illinois Pub. Risk Fund v. Purdue, #3 Exhibit C, New Hampshire v Purdue Transcript, #4 Exhibit D, Dallas Cty v. Purdue, #5 Exhibit E, Delta County v. Purdue, #6 Exhibit Van Zandt Cty v. Amerisourcebergen, #7 Exhibit G, Brooke County Commn v. Purdue, #8 Exhibit H, Weber Cty v. Purdue, #9 Exhibit I, Uintah Cty v. Purdue, #10 Exhibit J, City of Cambridge v. Purdue, #11 Exhibit K, Mecklenburg Cty v. Purdue, #12 Exhibit L, Greenville Cty v. Rite Aid, #13 Exhibit M, Anderson Cty v. Rite Aid, #14 Exhibit N, MDL McKesson Notice of Remand, #15 Exhibit O, MDL Cardinal Health, et al Notice of Consent to Remand, #16 Exhibit P, Kentucky v. Amerisourcebergen, Notice of Consent to Remand, #17 Exhibit Q, MDL Transcript 12/13/2017)(Richardson, Scott)
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Christopher Lovrien. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3791715. Filed by WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(Tull, John)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James W. Carlson. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3791712. Filed by WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(Tull, John)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Erin L. Burke. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3791705. Filed by WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(Tull, John)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Anticipated Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Walmart Inc, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, WSE Investment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Order)(Tull, John)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Anticipated Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12)(Tull, John)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint Or Move Or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc. (Tull, John)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants are given leave to file their reply, without objection. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/27/20. (dpb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Document Reply in Support of Motion)(Tull, John)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and taking under advisement in part #5 Motion to Enlarge Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. The deadline for Walmart to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter is extended by 30 days. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/25/2020. (ljb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ryan Younger on behalf of WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Younger, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint Or Move Or Otherwise Respond filed by All Plaintiffs. (Richardson, Scott)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite by All Plaintiffs (Richardson, Scott)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, W.Va. v. McKesson, #2 Exhibit B, Arlington County v. Purdue Pharma, #3 Exhibit C, Boston v. Purdue Pharma, #4 Exhibit D, Anderson County v. Rite Aid, #5 Exhibit E, City of El Monte v. Purdue Pharma, #6 Exhibit F, Oklahoma v. Purdue Pharma, #7 Exhibit G, McKesson Consent to Remand)(Richardson, Scott)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs (Richardson, Scott)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint Or Move Or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Tull, John)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by WSE Investment LLC, WSE Management LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Tull, John)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Pulaski County Arkansas, Jefferson County Arkansas. (ljb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Jefferson County Circuit Court, Case Number 35CV-20-503. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT078564. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct (submitted 8/21/2020)) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pulaski County Arkansas et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LLC
Represented By: Erin L. Burke
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: James W. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Erin L. Burke
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: James W. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSE Management LLC
Represented By: Erin L. Burke
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: James W. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSE Investment LLC
Represented By: Erin L. Burke
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: James W. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Erin L. Burke
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: James W. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East Inc
Represented By: Erin L. Burke
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: James W. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Erin L. Burke
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Represented By: Vincent O. Chadick
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: James W. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pulaski County Arkansas
Represented By: Sara Aguiniga
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Scott P. Richardson
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Dustin Blake McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson County Arkansas
Represented By: Sara Aguiniga
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Scott P. Richardson
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Dustin Blake McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?