Black v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: John Lee Black, Sr
Defendant: Blake Wilson, Shane Jones and Rowdy Sweet
Case Number: 4:2020cv00999
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #4 partial recommendation; allowing Black to proceed with his inadequate medical care and inhumane conditions of confinement claims against Sheriff Jones, Captain Sweet, and Chief Wilson; and dismissing all of Black's other claims without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/2020. (jbh)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Black be allowed to proceed with his inadequate medical care and inhumane conditions of confinement claims against Shane Jones, Rowdy Sweet and Blake Wilson, and that his #2 Complaint be served on them; Black's claims that he was fired from his trustee job and that his name was slandered be dismissed, without prejudice; and that Black's requests for release from incarceration and dismissal of his criminal charges be dismissed, without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/18/2020. (kdr)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PRO SE ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing plaintiff's custodian to collect an initial partial filing fee of $7.20 from plaintiff's institutional account and to send it to the Clerk; thereafter, plaintiff's custodian must collect monthly payments equal to 20% of the preceding month's income credited to his institutional account; provided that, at the time those payments are collected, the account has a balance which exceeds $10.00; the Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Pope County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/8/20. (tjb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by John Lee Black, Sr.(kdr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Lee Black, Sr. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowdy Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lee Black, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?