Hughes v. Russell et al
Plaintiff: Evon N Hughes
Defendant: Eric Evans, David Lee Russell and Sharon Marie Properties LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01160
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1437
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Evans and SMP, LLC filed by Eric Evans. (Ryan, Catherine)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/25/2020. (sjh)
November 24, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filers as Eric Evans and Sharon Marie Properties, LLC, as marked on the document. (jak)
November 23, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Eric Evans and Sharon Marie Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One)(Ryan, Catherine) (Docket text modified on 11/24/2020 to correct the party filers) (jak)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Order for Personal Service on Separate Defendant David Russell by Evon N Hughes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ramm, Natalie)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Evon N Hughes. (Ramm, Natalie)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Evans and SMP, LLC filed by Evon N Hughes. (Ramm, Natalie)
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to David Lee Russell. (bmd)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sharon Marie Properties LLC.(Ryan, Catherine)
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Eric Evans.(Ryan, Catherine)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Evans and SMP, LLC by Eric Evans (Ryan, Catherine)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Ryan on behalf of Sharon Marie Properties LLC (Ryan, Catherine)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Ryan on behalf of Eric Evans (Ryan, Catherine)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Eric Evans served on 10/13/2020. (bmd)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Sharon Marie Properties LLC served on 10/13/2020. (bmd)
October 7, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Defendants' Addresses (Ramm, Natalie)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing Plaintiff to file the mailing addresses of each of the Defendants listed in the Complaint; and directing the Clerk to prepare the summonses and the United States Marshal to serve the summons and complaint on the Defendants without prepayment of costs once the Plaintiff has supplied the addresses. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/5/2020. (jbh)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Evon N Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Evon N Hughes. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Evans
Represented By: Catherine A. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lee Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Marie Properties LLC
Represented By: Catherine A. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evon N Hughes
Represented By: Natalie Ramm
Represented By: Jason Auer
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?