Vient v. Wehco Media Inc et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Vient
Defendant: Chattanooga Times Free Press and Wehco Media Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv01219
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to file with CM/ECF or, alternately, Use my Electronic Signature on Documents filed by Benjamin Vient. (fjg) (Docket text modified on 11/30/2020 to correct a typographical error)(jak)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend the Complaint and Request for Preliminary Injunction in Response in Opposition to #13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Benjamin Vient. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(fjg)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Hearing filed by Benjamin Vient. (fjg)
November 12, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #15 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "RESPONSE re #1 Complaint and #9 Motion for Injunctive Relief" as marked on the document. (jak)
November 10, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #1 Complaint and #9 Motion for Injunctive Relief (Gaines, Robert) (Docket text modified on 11/12/2020 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
November 10, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Gaines, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaines, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Wehco Media Inc (Gaines, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Chattanooga Times Free Press (Gaines, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Gaines on behalf of All Defendants (Gaines, Robert)
November 10, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the service date as 10/20/2020 as indicated by the document. (cmn)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Hearing by Benjamin Vient (jap)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Vient. Alec Gaines, registered agent for Chattanooga Times Free Press, Wehco Media Inc served on 10/20/2020. (jap) (Docket text modified on 11/10/2020 to correct the service date.) (cmn)
October 30, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include "with Jury Demand" as marked on the document. (cmn)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT on the Filing of an Action or Determination regarding a Copyright submitted electronically by the Clerk's office to the Register of Copyrights on 10/19/2020. (cdw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #5 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker. (jak)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer this case to the Honorable Kristine Baker. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/15/2020. (jbh)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #2 #3 Plaintiff's Motions for Orders, because pro se litigants are not permitted to file electronically in the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/14/20. (dmm)
October 14, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 MOTION. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 10/13/2020. (jak)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to File with CM/ECF by Benjamin Vient. (bmd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Receive Service of Documents and Notice of Electronic Filings Via the Court's Electronic Filing System by Benjamin Vient. (bmd) (Docket entry modified on 10/14/2020 to correct the file date) (jak)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against All Defendants filed by Benjamin Vient. Fee $400 received. Receipt Number LIT079298. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vient v. Wehco Media Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga Times Free Press
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wehco Media Inc
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Vient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?