Southwestern Bell Telephone Company v. GD Construction Inc
Plaintiff: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company doing business as AT&T Arkansas
Defendant: GD Construction Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv01267
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for week beginning 10/18/2021 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Discovery due by 5/21/2021; Motions due by 6/21/2021; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 9/17/2021. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/16/2020. (ljb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by GD Construction Inc. Joint (Hill, Zachary)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/4/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/19/2021; Jury Trial set for 10/18/2021 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/3/2020. (ljb)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by GD Construction Inc.(Hill, Zachary)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Pickell, J.)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Motion for Warning Order. Signed by Circuit Judge on 8/20/2020. (ljb)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against GD Construction Inc filed by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (ljb)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GD Construction Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-20-2014. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT079416. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company v. GD Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GD Construction Inc
Represented By: Zachary Richmond Hill
Represented By: Emily M. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company doing business as AT&T Arkansas
Represented By: J. Slocum Pickell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?