Wince et al v. Thurston et al
Plaintiff: Marquisa Wince and Mary Cantwell
Defendant: Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, John Thurston, James Harmon Smith, III, James Sharp, Charles Roberts and Sharon Brooks
Case Number: 4:2020cv01278
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: This case is consolidated sua sponte with Wince, et al. v. Thurston, et al., case number 4:20-cv-1274-BSM. The clerk is directed to terminate case number 4:20-cv-1278-BSM. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/28/2020. (kdr)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Declaration of Daniel Shults)(Wagner, Vincent)
October 28, 2020 Cases associated. Create association to 4:20-cv-01274-BSM, per #13 Order. (kdr)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Cantrell on behalf of All Defendants (Cantrell, Michael)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Allen Mosley on behalf of All Defendants (Mosley, Michael)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #8 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion. The Court directs the Clerk to reassign this case to Judge Miller by chip exchange. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/27/2020. (jak)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Mary Cantwell, Marquisa Wince. (Tull, John)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The Court would appreciate an expedited response by noon tomorrow, 27 October 2020, to the motion to consolidate, Doc. 5. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/26/2020. (slb)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by All Defendants. (ajt)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mary Cantwell, Marquisa Wince. (ajt)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mary Cantwell, Marquisa Wince. (ajt)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mary Cantwell, Marquisa Wince.(ajt)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-20-5928. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT079469. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wince et al v. Thurston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilenda Harris-Ritter
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Luther
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Harmon Smith, III
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sharp
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Roberts
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Brooks
Represented By: Vincent Moore Wagner
Represented By: Michael Allen Mosley
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquisa Wince
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Cantwell
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?