Kanu v. Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lionel Kanu
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv01395
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/1/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/15/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/18/2022 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/22/2020. (rmg)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #4 Lionel Kanu's motion to remand because the parties are diverse, and the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/18/2020. (kdr)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court /Response to Motion to Remand filed by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Young, Regina)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Remand to State Court filed by Lionel Kanu. (Cordero, Christopher)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lionel Kanu (Cordero, Christopher)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Young, Regina)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company filed by Lionel Kanu.(bmd)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-20-5792. Fee $400 received, receipt number LIT079867. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanu v. Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Regina Ann Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Kanu
Represented By: Christopher A. Cordero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?