Adams et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Adams, Brandon Adams and Christy Adams
Defendant: Pure Insurance Company and Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv01410
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #20 Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #20 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; dismissing without prejudice Pure Insurance Company and Brandon Adams; and finding as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/31/2020. (cmn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2021: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
December 30, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Reply to Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Henry, Judy)
December 30, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 Response to Motion, Brief in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Judy)
December 30, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal jurisdiction Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Henry, Judy)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply. Accordingly, Plaintiffs must file the reply, attached to the motion as an exhibit, by 5 p.m., Monday, January 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/28/20. (dmm)
December 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Their Motion to Remand by Brandon Adams, Bryan Adams, Christy Adams (Henry, Judy)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 ADDENDUM filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company to #12 Response to Motion. Exhibit A (Hall, Ben)
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Response to Motion to Remand filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Hall, Ben)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Hall, Ben)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and lack of personal jurisdiction filed by Pure Insurance Company. (Rupe, Alan)
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and lack of personal jurisdiction by Pure Insurance Company (Rupe, Alan)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Remand to State Court Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Brandon Adams, Bryan Adams, Christy Adams. (Henry, Judy)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Brandon Adams, Bryan Adams, Christy Adams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Henry, Judy)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/9/2021. Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/23/2021. Jury Trial set for 1/4/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 12/3/20. (mmb)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Circuit Judge Charles E. Clawson. (jbh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Pure Insurance Company. (jbh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Alan L. Rupe on behalf of Pure Insurance Company. (jbh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (jbh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bryan Adams, Brandon Adams, Christy Adams. (jbh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cincinnati Insurance Company from Faulkner County Circuit Court, case number 23CV-20-01148-3. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT079952. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pure Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Michael Strauss
Represented By: Ben C. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Adams
Represented By: Jacob Post Fair
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Adams
Represented By: Jacob Post Fair
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Adams
Represented By: Jacob Post Fair
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?