Pennington v. Watson et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Pennington, Jr
Defendant: Dexter Payne, R Watson, Leslie Rutledge, Andy Shock, Herbert T Wright, Jr, James Dycus, Larry Jegley, Charonda Rushing, Terri Hollingsworth, John Felts, Asa Hutchinson, Harris, Does Members ofArkansas Board of Parole and Bradley
Case Number: 4:2020cv01420
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. This case was dismissed today. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/13/20. (dmm)
January 13, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Frederick Pennington, Jr. (ljb)
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jbh)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT: Based on the #10 order today, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/13/2021. (jbh)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; denying #5 , #9 Motions for Leave to Amend; and dismissing this case without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. An in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/13/2021. (jbh)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Permission to Amend by Frederick Pennington, Jr. (kdr)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Frederick Pennington, Jr.(kdr)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Plaintiff has an additional 30 days to file his amended complaint. Plaintiff should note that he is not required to submit grievances or grievance responses with his amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/30/2020. (cfd)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Complaint by Frederick Pennington, Jr. (llg)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint and for Preliminary Injunction by Frederick Pennington, Jr. (llg)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to send a blank 1983 complaint form to Pennington. In the event Pennington fails to file an amended complaint conforming to this Order within 30 days, the Court will recommend this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/7/2020. (ljb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Frederick Pennington, Jr. (kdr)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Frederick Pennington, Jr.(kdr)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frederick Pennington, Jr. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington v. Watson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert T Wright, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dycus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jegley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charonda Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Members ofArkansas Board of Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Pennington, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?