Hyatt v. Phillips et al
Plaintiff: Richard Douglas Hyatt
Defendant: Brent Standridge, Grisham A Phillips, Rebecca Bush, Greg Sink, Chris Walton and Saline County Circuit Court
Case Number: 4:2020cv01433
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Joe J Volpe
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Petitioner's motion for copies #11 . The notices requested are undeliverable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/1/2021. (lej)
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Copies and NOTICE by Richard Douglas Hyatt. (llg)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs; directing the Clerk to mail Mr. Hyatt an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet; and directing Mr. Hyatt, if he wishes to proceed with this action, within 30 days of the date of this Order, to either (1) pay the entire $5.00 filing fee; or (2) submit a properly completed and updated Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet signed by an authorized official at the incarcerating facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 01/25/2021. (ajt)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Richard Douglas Hyatt re #2 Order, IFP Application. Resent to updated address. (fjg)
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Richard Douglas Hyatt re #4 Order. Previously resent to updated address. (fjg)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Douglas Hyatt. (kdr)
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Douglas Hyatt. (cmn)
December 24, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Richard Douglas Hyatt re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Richard Douglas Hyatt. (llg)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Mr. Hyatt to comply with LR 5.5(c)(2) within 30 days of the date of this order or I will recommend dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/23/2020. (lej)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Richard Douglas Hyatt re #2 Order. (fjg)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk shall mail to Petitioner an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this action, he must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either (1) pay the $5 statutory filing fee in full; (2) file a properly completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with a calculation sheet. Failure to timely and properly comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice, pursuant to LR 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/11/2020. (lej)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Richard Douglas Hyatt. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyatt v. Phillips et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Standridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grisham A Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Sink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Douglas Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?