Shamoon v. Emberton et al
Plaintiff: Michael Shamoon
Defendant: Van Buren County, Arkansas and Lucas Emberton
Case Number: 4:2020cv01444
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/7/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/20/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/13/2022 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/28/2021. (rmg)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lucas Emberton, Van Buren County, Arkansas.(Owens, Jason)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Shamoon. Van Buren County, Arkansas served on 12/14/2020. (Tester, Kent)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Shamoon. Lucas Emberton served on 12/17/2020. (Tester, Kent)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Michael Shamoon. (Fee $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT080101.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shamoon v. Emberton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shamoon
Represented By: Kent Tester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren County, Arkansas
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Emberton
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?