Think Rubix LLC v. Be Woke.Vote et al
Plaintiff: Think Rubix LLC
Defendant: CLIMB Organization LLC, Hyper Engine LLC, Robert F Smith, KHRodgers LLC, Darrick Angelone, AONE Entertainment LLC, BeWokeVote LLC, Deon Taylor, Be Woke LLC, Be WokeVote, Hidden Empire Film Group LP, Roxanne Taylor, Be.Woke.Vote LLC and Be Woke.Vote
Case Number: 4:2021cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Think Rubix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Social Media Posts on Facebook, #2 Exhibit 2- Social Media Posts on Twitter, #3 Exhibit 3- Affidavit of Tristan Wilkerson)(Phillips, Antwan)
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by All Defendants. (Tull, John)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration, #3 Exhibit C-Declaration, #4 Exhibit D-Declaration, #5 Exhibit E-Declaration, #6 Exhibit F-Declaration, #7 Exhibit G-Declaration, #8 Exhibit H-Declaration, #9 Exhibit I-Declaration, #10 Exhibit J-Declaration)(Tull, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/12/2021. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/26/2021. Bench Trial set for 3/8/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 2/1/21. (mmb)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint All Defendants. The answer to the complaint is due on or before 5:00 P.M., February 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/1/21. (mmb)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ryan Younger on behalf of All Defendants (Younger, Robert)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants (Tull, John)
January 7, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and returned to counsel for service. (llg)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark submitted by the Clerk's office to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on 1/7/2021. (cdw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Think Rubix LLC. (Fee $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT080349.) No summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Think Rubix LLC v. Be Woke.Vote et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLIMB Organization LLC
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyper Engine LLC
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F Smith
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHRodgers LLC
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrick Angelone
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AONE Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BeWokeVote LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deon Taylor
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Be Woke LLC
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Be WokeVote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hidden Empire Film Group LP
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Taylor
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Be.Woke.Vote LLC
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Be Woke.Vote
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Think Rubix LLC
Represented By: Karl Brandon Middleton
Represented By: Antwan D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?