Burton v. Department of the Navy
Plaintiff: Stacey L Burton
Defendant: Department of the Navy
Case Number: 4:2021cv00021
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Summons Issued and returned to attorney for plaintiff as to Secretary, Department of the Navy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jap)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Burton's lawyer to prepare a summons, which the Clerk will issue, for Secretary Braithwaite. Counsel must deliver process to the U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas. The Court directs the Marshal to serve the summons and complaint without prepayment of fees. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/2021. (ajt)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Department of the Navy filed by Stacey L Burton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stacey L Burton. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey L Burton
Represented By: James W. Stanley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?