Pete v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Eileen Pete
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00056
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Runyon, Emily)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File by Eileen Pete (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ellis, John)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Runyon, Emily)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 motion for leave to file a reply brief; and directing State Farm to file its reply brief within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/19/2021. (ajt)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Instanter Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Runyon, Emily)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Response to Motion filed by Eileen Pete. (LeVar, Alan)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Eileen Pete. (LeVar, Alan)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Filing fee of $100.00 received re #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt # LIT080776. (fjg)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Filing fee of $100.00 received re #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt # LIT080776. (fjg) (Docket text modified on 2/5/2021 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 , #9 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice of Joseph A. Cancila, Jr., and Sondra Hemeryck. They shall appear as counsel of record for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/4/2021. (jbh)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Pro Hac Vice by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Runyon, Emily)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Pro Hac Vice by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Runyon, Emily)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/2/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/16/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 1/10/2022 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/01/2021. (tmw)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Runyon, Emily)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Runyon, Emily)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Runyon, Emily)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Eileen Pete. (jbh)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Eileen Pete. (jbh)(Docket text modified on 1/22/2021 to correct the description of the document filed)(jak)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Conway County Circuit Court, case number 15CV-20-227. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT080594. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION" as marked on the document. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pete v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily M. Runyon
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila, Jr.
Represented By: Sondra A. Hemeryck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Pete
Represented By: Alan J. LeVar
Represented By: Jose Miguel Ruiz
Represented By: John Andrew Ellis
Represented By: Colton Gregory
Represented By: John Colton Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?