Miles v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hazel Lee Miles
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00072
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Hill, Zachary)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/29/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/12/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 1/31/2022 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 01/27/2021. (tmw)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hill, Zachary)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Hazel Lee Miles. (jbh)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-20-07402. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT080616. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Zachary Richmond Hill
Represented By: Emily M. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Lee Miles
Represented By: Brindon Chase Mangiapane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?