Raper v. Warren, City of et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Dawn McClain Raper
Defendant: Denisa Pennington, Shawn Hildreth, Does Warren Arkansas City Council Members; Police Officer Alex, Robbie Ashcraft, Tim Nichols, Warren, City of, Brighton, Tim Brighton and Alex Meeks
Case Number: 4:2021cv00094
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #6 Order that was entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/30/2021. (ljb)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #4 Ms. Raper's Amended Complaint for lack of jurisdiction over Ms. Raper's claims. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/30/2021. (ljb)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 ADDENDUM to Complaint Under Rule 15 filed by Carrie Dawn McClain Raper to #2 #4 . (jap)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Robbie Ashcraft, Brighton, Does, Shawn Hildreth, Tim Nichols, Denisa Pennington, Warren, City of, (adding Alex Meeks), filed by Carrie Dawn McClain Raper. (jap)
February 9, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed to include that #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted as marked on the Order. (jak)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of this Order, Ms. Raper must file an Amended Complaint fixing the deficiencies identified. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/8/2021. (ljb)(Docket text modified on 2/9/2021 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Carrie Dawn McClain Raper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carrie Dawn McClain Raper. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raper v. Warren, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denisa Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Hildreth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Warren Arkansas City Council Members; Police Officer Alex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Brighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Dawn McClain Raper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?