Hall v. Higgins
Plaintiff: Carlos Hall, Sr
Defendant: Eric S Higgins
Case Number: 4:2021cv00106
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 motion to extend time.Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/17/2021.(gmh)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/22/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/5/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/1/2022 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 2/12/2021. (rmg)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Requests by Eric S Higgins (Depper, Margaret)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Eric S Higgins.(kdr)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Eric S Higgins, filed by Carlos Hall, Sr.(kdr)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Eric S Higgins.(kdr)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Eric S Higgins, filed by Carlos Hall, Sr.(kdr)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eric S Higgins from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-19-7264. Fee of $402 paid, Receipt Number LIT080842. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric S Higgins
Represented By: Margaret Diane Depper
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Hall, Sr
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?