Al v. Oklahoma, State of et al
Plaintiff: Alaahcontayna Al
Defendant: Oklahoma, State of, Vic Regalado, S Lillie, City of Tulsa Police Dept, A McGowan, Tulsa County Bar Foundation Inc, Tulsa, City of, Tulsa Police Department and Kelly Greenough
Case Number: 4:2021cv00150
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #14 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must either pay the $505 appellate filing fee in this Court or file a motion to appeal in forma pauperis with the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 04/20/2021. (ajt)
April 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis by Alaahcontayna Al. (jap)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Alaahcontayna Al: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to pay the fee in the district court or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of this order. (ajt)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff, within 30 days of this order's date, to either pay to this Court the $505.00 appellate filing and docketing fees; or file, with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Plaintiff to file any future documents or pleadings related to his appeal with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 04/02/2021. (ajt)
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Alaahcontayna Al. (ajt)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Alaahcontayna Al: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (ajt)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Alaahcontayna Al: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to pay the fee in the district court or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of this order. (ajt)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 USCA Docketing Letter as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Alaahcontayna Al. USCA Case Number 21-1674. (ajt)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #6 Notice of Appeal re #4 Order and #5 Judgment. (ajt)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order and #5 Judgment by Alaahcontayna Al. (ajt)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #4 Order that was entered on this day, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/16/2021. (ljb)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis; and dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/16/2021. (ljb)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed on behalf of Alaahcontayna Al. (ljb)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Alaahcontayna Al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alaahcontayna Al. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al v. Oklahoma, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vic Regalado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tulsa Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County Bar Foundation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Greenough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaahcontayna Al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?