Pipkins v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Laquesha Pipkins
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv00170
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 03/26/2021. (llg)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Social Security Administration served on 4/5/2021. (llg)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jonathan Ross, Acting US Attorney for Eastern District of Arkansas served on 3/23/2021. (llg)
March 10, 2021 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to complete the USM-285 form and forward a summons together with a copy of the complaint to the United States Marshals Service for service of process to all necessary Defendants in this case without prepayment of fees from the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/9/21. (glr)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing re #3 Order filed by Laquesha Pipkins. (fjg)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court hereby directs Plaintiff to provide within 30 days of this Order her monthly income. Plaintiff's failure to comply within the required period of time may result in summary dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/04/2021. (lmc)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Laquesha Pipkins.(kdr)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laquesha Pipkins. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pipkins v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquesha Pipkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?