Bell et al v. Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Angelia M Bell and Kenneth Robinson
Defendant: Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00187
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Daniel Hornung on behalf of Geico Advantage Insurance Company (Hornung, Nicholas)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/1/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/14/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 9/12/2022 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 3/24/2021. (rmg)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal lacks and original signature (F.R.Cv.P.11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (thd)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Geico Advantage Insurance Company.(kdr)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Geico Advantage Insurance Company, filed by Angelia M Belland Kenneth Robinson.(kdr)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Geico Advantage Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-21-1024. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT081170. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2021: #2 Main Document - Correct, #3 Civil Cover Sheet - Correct) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell et al v. Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelia M Bell
Represented By: Anthony Bryce Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Robinson
Represented By: Anthony Bryce Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Hornung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?